AZ SB1173 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community colleges; out-of-county reimbursement
Title
Community colleges; out-of-county reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Community College District
Community College District Finance
Community Colleges (h)
County
Education - Title 15
Emergency (h)
Full-time Equivalent Student
Intergovernmental Agreement
Levy Limitation
Nonresident State Students
Out-of-county Reimbursement
Primary Property Tax
Property Tax Levy
State General Fund
Taxation - Title 42
Community College District Finance
Community Colleges (h)
County
Education - Title 15
Emergency (h)
Full-time Equivalent Student
Intergovernmental Agreement
Levy Limitation
Nonresident State Students
Out-of-county Reimbursement
Primary Property Tax
Property Tax Levy
State General Fund
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1469 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |