AZ SB1173 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; emergency shelter; transitional housing
Title
Appropriation; emergency shelter; transitional housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-26 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Department Of Economic Security
Des
Emergency Shelter
Temporary Emergency Shelter
Transitional Housing
Appropriation
Department Of Economic Security
Des
Emergency Shelter
Temporary Emergency Shelter
Transitional Housing