AZ SB1172 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - House read second time
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender registration; requirements; vehicles
Title
Sex offender registration; requirements; vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |