AZ SB1172 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Family caregivers; pilot; grant program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family caregivers; pilot; grant program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2019-01-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431073.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71729
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1172p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1172s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.11721236.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1172mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1172fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1172cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1172appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71729&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71729&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71729&billStatusActionId=186794&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71729&billStatusActionId=187209&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71729&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71729&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71729&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback