AZ SB1167 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health information organizations; confidentiality; data
Title
Health information organizations; confidentiality; data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Confidentiality
Data
Emergency
Health Care Professional
Health Care Provider
Health Information Organizations
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Vaccinations (h)
Data
Emergency
Health Care Professional
Health Care Provider
Health Information Organizations
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Vaccinations (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 664 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |