AZ SB1167 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Merit council; law enforcement qualifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merit council; law enforcement qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurs
2018-05-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-03SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-26HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2018-02-01SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70222
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1167p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1167s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1167h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1167griffin0948.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1167leach.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1167appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70222&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70222&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=180055&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=180077&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=180085&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=180089&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70222&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70222&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70222&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=182957&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=182975&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=183641&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70222&billStatusActionId=183644&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback