AZ SB1167 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Photo radar; prohibition
Title
Photo radar; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |