AZ SB1165 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Interscholastic; intramural athletics; biological sex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interscholastic; intramural athletics; biological sex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30SenateChapter 106
2022-03-30SenateGovernor Signed
2022-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-03-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-03-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-24-5-0)
2022-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2022-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-14HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2022-03-09HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2022-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2022-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-02-28HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2022-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-02-02HouseTransmit to House
2022-02-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2022-02-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2022-02-01SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-01SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2022-01-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-01-20SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2022-01-18SenateSenate read second time
2022-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2022-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15120.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76637
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/sb1165p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/sb1165s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0106.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491698
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/496562
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/496862
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/497933
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498375
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498439
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76637&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76637&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76637&billStatusActionId=207437&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76637&billStatusActionId=207449&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76637&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76637&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76637&billStatusActionId=210705&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76637&billStatusActionId=210711&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback