AZ SB1165 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - House third reading FAILED voting: (24-36-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Texting while driving; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting while driving; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (24-36-0-0)
2019-04-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2019-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
283154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283174Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28672Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28914New CodeSee Bill Text
28963Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71720
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1165p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1165s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1165h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1165livingston4.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.11650212.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1165tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1165campbell.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1165transportation.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71720&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71720&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71720&billStatusActionId=187600&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71720&billStatusActionId=187613&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71720&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71720&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71720&billStatusActionId=189023&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71720&billStatusActionId=189025&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback