AZ SB1163 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Substance abuse treatment; AHCCCS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance abuse treatment; AHCCCS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-09HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-05HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-06HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-03SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-29SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2020-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8882Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8883Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8884Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback