AZ SB1163 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-14 - Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; prostitution; employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; prostitution; employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-14SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0)
2019-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback