AZ SB1163 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Release procedures; hearings; bonds
Title
Release procedures; hearings; bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Jamescita Peshlakai [D] | Sen. Martin Quezada [D] |
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. David Stringer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |