AZ SB1161 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Affordable housing; development standards; report
Title
Affordable housing; development standards; report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | House | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affordable Housing (h)
Annual Report (h)
Applicability
Cities And Towns - Title 9 (h)
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Development Standards (h)
Earned Time Credit
Earning Safe Reentry Through Work Act Of 2023
Effective Date
Housing Assistance (h)
Housing Developments (h)
Municipal Housing Needs Assessment (h)
Preference (h)
Probation
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (h)
Reporting
Reports (h)
State Residents (h)
Transit-oriented Development (h)
Work Time Credit
Work Time Credits
Annual Report (h)
Applicability
Cities And Towns - Title 9 (h)
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Development Standards (h)
Earned Time Credit
Earning Safe Reentry Through Work Act Of 2023
Effective Date
Housing Assistance (h)
Housing Developments (h)
Municipal Housing Needs Assessment (h)
Preference (h)
Probation
Public Health And Safety - Title 36 (h)
Reporting
Reports (h)
State Residents (h)
Transit-oriented Development (h)
Work Time Credit
Work Time Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1426 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 461.18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 469 | New Code | See Bill Text |