AZ SB1160 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Driving violations; restricted licenses; penalties
Title
Driving violations; restricted licenses; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Jamescita Peshlakai [D] | Sen. Martin Quezada [D] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Traffic Violations
Driver Licenses
Driving
Driving Privileges
Justice And Municipal Courts
Penalties
Permit
Restricted Licenses
Transportation
Violations
Driver Licenses
Driving
Driving Privileges
Justice And Municipal Courts
Penalties
Permit
Restricted Licenses
Transportation
Violations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2328 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3482 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3483 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 857 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |