AZ SB1159 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dentists; restricted permits; continuing education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentists; restricted permits; continuing education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21SenateChapter 229
2024-06-21SenateGovernor Signed
2024-06-15SenateTransmitted to Governor
2024-06-15SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-1-4-0)
2024-06-15SenateSenate concurs
2024-06-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2024-06-14SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2024-06-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2024-06-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-2-0)
2024-06-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-04-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2024-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2024-03-18HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-2-0-0)
2024-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2024-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-03-12HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2024-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2024-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2024-03-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2024-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2024-02-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2024-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2024-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2024-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321239Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/80616
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/sb1159p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/sb1159s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/sb1159h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/laws/0229.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/S.1159SHAMP.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/adopted/S.1159HHS.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/H.1159MONTENEGRO.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/adopted/H.1159HEALTH HUMAN SERVICES.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/514173
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/516866
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/517430
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/517927
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/519917
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/519957
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/520259
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=225594&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=225724&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80616&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=226507&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=227409&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=227474&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=227530&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80616&billStatusActionId=227537&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback