AZ SB1159 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil liability; damages; weapons
Title
Civil liability; damages; weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |