AZ SB1158 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; widening; Interstate 17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; widening; Interstate 17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-09HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-05HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-03-05HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2020-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-18SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0)
2020-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-22SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73207
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1158p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1158s.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73207&billStatusActionId=194488&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73207&billStatusActionId=194959&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73207&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback