AZ SB1156 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibited electronic data; metadata collection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited electronic data; metadata collection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-03SenateSenate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback