AZ SB1155 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - House JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Catalytic converters; crime; classification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Catalytic converters; crime; classification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2023-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-16HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0)
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-09SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2023-01-25SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133728Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78757
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1155p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1155s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1155KOLODIN.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502710
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506582
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78757&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78757&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78757&billStatusActionId=215749&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78757&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback