AZ SB1155 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Antitrust enforcement; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Antitrust enforcement; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-09HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-02-25HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-18HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2021-02-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2021-01-19SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74695
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1155p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1155s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1155mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1155com.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483500
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483680
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485637
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486566
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486613
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486582
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486869
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74695&billStatusActionId=200722&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74695&billStatusActionId=201081&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback