AZ SB1154 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation electrification study committee
Title
Transportation electrification study committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |