AZ SB1154 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
G&F omnibus
Title
G&F omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Chapter 13 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |