AZ SB1154 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Physical therapists; dry needling

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical therapists; dry needling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-24 Chapter 220
2014-04-24 Governor Signed
2014-04-23 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-22HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-04-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0)
2014-04-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2014-03-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-03-12HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2014-03-11HouseReferred to House HEALTH Committee
2014-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2014-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2014-03-03SenateTransmit to House
2014-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-6-3-0)
2014-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-19SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2014-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2014-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=SB1154
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.11541231.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.1154259.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.1154hhs.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/1154ward802.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.1154-p1-carter.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154.shhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154.hhealth.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/sb1154.hthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback