AZ SB1154 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cotton council; employee benefits
Title
Cotton council; employee benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] |
Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | House third reading , voting: (40-19-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-24 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Consent Calendar February 07, 2011 @ 2:45 PM | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |