AZ SB1151 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Contracts; licensure requirements; exemption; exclusion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts; licensure requirements; exemption; exclusion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateChapter 124
2021-03-24SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-03-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-03-02HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-25HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-01-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-01-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-01-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-01-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2021-01-19SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74655
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1151p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1151s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0124.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480585
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485996
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486287
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486581
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487297
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488152
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74655&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74655&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74655&billStatusActionId=198849&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74655&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74655&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74655&billStatusActionId=203241&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback