AZ SB1147 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Livestock compensation; appropriation
Title
Livestock compensation; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |