AZ SB1146 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2127
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire suppression; assistance; private landowners.
Title
Fire suppression; assistance; private landowners.
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Chapter 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-4-3-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2127 (Replaces) 2022-02-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Arizona Department Of Forestry And Fire Management (dffm)
Assistance
Exemption
Financial Assistance
Fire Suppression
Laws
Private Landowners
Reimbursement
Reports
Special Session
Supplemental Appropriation
Wildfire Emergency Response
Assistance
Exemption
Financial Assistance
Fire Suppression
Laws
Private Landowners
Reimbursement
Reports
Special Session
Supplemental Appropriation
Wildfire Emergency Response