AZ SB1146 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2166
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle fees; alternative fuel VLT.
Title
Vehicle fees; alternative fuel VLT.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2166 (Replaced by) 2018-04-25 - Chapter 265
Subjects
Alternative Fuel Vlt
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Fees
Vehicle License Tax
Vlt
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Fees
Vehicle License Tax
Vlt
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2007 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5805 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |