AZ SB1144 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Central bank digital currency; prohibition
Title
Central bank digital currency; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-1-0) |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | House | House MOE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-1-0-0-0) |
2023-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6 (h)
Central Bank Digital Currency (h)
Cities And Towns - Title 9 (h)
Conduct Of Elections
Counties - Title 11 (h)
Currency (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Ballot Adjudication
General Provisions - Title 1 (h)
Legal Tender (h)
Proceedings At The Counting Center
Prohibition
Taxation Of Income - Title 43 (h)
Uniform Commercial Code - Title 47 (h)
Central Bank Digital Currency (h)
Cities And Towns - Title 9 (h)
Conduct Of Elections
Counties - Title 11 (h)
Currency (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Ballot Adjudication
General Provisions - Title 1 (h)
Legal Tender (h)
Proceedings At The Counting Center
Prohibition
Taxation Of Income - Title 43 (h)
Uniform Commercial Code - Title 47 (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 843 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 1443 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |