AZ SB1142 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
SMI; employment; income tax credits
Title
SMI; employment; income tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-2-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Corporations
Employment
Gross Income
Income Tax Credits
Purpose
Serious Mental Illness
Smi
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Employment
Gross Income
Income Tax Credits
Purpose
Serious Mental Illness
Smi
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1163 | New Code | See Bill Text |