AZ SB1142 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Paycheck deductions; employee authorization.
Title
Paycheck deductions; employee authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |