AZ SB1141 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House LARA Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House LARA Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona beef council; continuation.
Title
Arizona beef council; continuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | House LARA Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3018.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |