AZ SB1139 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Redistricting; legislative district one

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting; legislative district one

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateChapter 217
2019-05-13SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0)
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-05HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-12HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-28SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2019-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161101New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71686
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1139p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1139s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0217.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1139flrkf.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1139salman.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71686&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71686&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71686&billStatusActionId=186123&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71686&billStatusActionId=186270&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71686&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71686&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71686&billStatusActionId=188623&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71686&billStatusActionId=189374&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback