AZ SB1139 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Marriage of minors; emancipation required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage of minors; emancipation required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25122Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback