AZ SB1134 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; named claimants
Title
Appropriations; named claimants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 83 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-04-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |