AZ SB1133 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certified nurse midwives; nurse practitioners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified nurse midwives; nurse practitioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateChapter 80
2017-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2017-03-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-02HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-06HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-31SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-25SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-19SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321606Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68882
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1133p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1133s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0080.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1133hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.11330906.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68882&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68882&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68882&billStatusActionId=174234&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68882&billStatusActionId=174145&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68882&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68882&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68882&billStatusActionId=176567&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback