AZ SB1133 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - House GOV Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Building code moratorium; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building code moratorium; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-18HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Held
2014-02-24HouseReferred to House GOV Committee
2014-02-24HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2014-02-20HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2014-02-03SenateTransmit to House
2014-02-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2014-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-01-21SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-23SenateSenate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2014-01-22SenateReferred to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2014-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate GE Committee
2014-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback