AZ SB1133 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House TRANS Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle dealer licensing; exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle dealer licensing; exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-15 House TRANS Committee action: Held
2012-02-15 Referred to House TRANS Committee
2012-02-15 House read second time
2012-02-14 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-02-14 Assigned to House TRANS Committee
2012-02-14 Introduced in House and read first time
2012-02-02 Transmit to House
2012-02-02 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2012-01-30 Senate Consent Calendar January 30, 2012 @ 1:56 PM
2012-01-31 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-31 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-30 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2012-01-18 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-26 Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2012-01-19 Referred to Senate FIN Committee
2012-01-19 Senate NRT Committee action: Withdrawn
2012-01-19 Referred to Senate NRT Committee
2012-01-19 Senate read second time
2012-01-18 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-19 Assigned to Senate FIN Committee
2012-01-18 Assigned to Senate NRT Committee
2012-01-18 Introduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback