AZ SB1131 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; K-3 reading program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; K-3 reading program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateChapter 67
2017-03-24SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-21SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-1-0-0)
2017-03-21SenateSenate concurs
2017-03-21SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-03-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (47-10-3-0)
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-27HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-16HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-31SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-26SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-19SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15742Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15743Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68880
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1131p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1131s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1131h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0067.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1131edu.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.11311207.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1131allen s1049.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1131norgaard.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=174902&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=174748&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68880&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=176494&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=176565&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=176607&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68880&billStatusActionId=176612&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback