AZ SB1124 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contributions in aid of construction
Title
Contributions in aid of construction
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 430 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-2-0) |
2021-06-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Contribution In Aid Of Construction
Contributions (h)
Income Tax
Public Service Corporations
Retroactivity
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Contributions (h)
Income Tax
Public Service Corporations
Retroactivity
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 224.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3954 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1074.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1163 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 225 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |