AZ SB1123 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disruption; educational institution; concealed weapon
Title
Disruption; educational institution; concealed weapon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concealed Weapon
Criminal Code - Title 13
Disruption
Educational Institutions
Offenses Against Public Order
Criminal Code - Title 13
Disruption
Educational Institutions
Offenses Against Public Order