AZ SB1122 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human remains; search; rescue; canines
Title
Human remains; search; rescue; canines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 850 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |