AZ SB1120 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Chiropractic services; business entities
Title
Chiropractic services; business entities
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (32-26-2-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House ERA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Consent Calendar January 24, 2011 @ 2:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |