AZ SB1115 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans of overseas conflicts plates
Title
Veterans of overseas conflicts plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
License Plates
Special Plates
State Highway Fund
Transportation - Title 28
Veterans Of Overseas Conflicts
License Plates
Special Plates
State Highway Fund
Transportation - Title 28
Veterans Of Overseas Conflicts
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |