AZ SB1114 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Joint power authorities; fingerprinting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint power authorities; fingerprinting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateChapter 38
2018-03-20SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48805.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69926
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1114p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1114s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0038.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.11141126.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1114gov.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69926&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69926&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69926&billStatusActionId=180547&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69926&billStatusActionId=180870&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69926&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69926&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69926&billStatusActionId=182497&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback