AZ SB1114 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; veterans' services; veterans' home
Title
Appropriation; veterans' services; veterans' home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |