AZ SB1113 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unused tax credit; termination; time
Title
Unused tax credit; termination; time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Chapter 174 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Corporate Income Tax (h)
Income Tax Credits
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Termination
Time (h)
Unused Tax Credit
Income Tax Credits
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Termination
Time (h)
Unused Tax Credit