AZ SB1110 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax subtraction; uniformed services pay
Title
Tax subtraction; uniformed services pay
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |