AZ SB1110 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Title
Navigable stream adjudication commission; extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | House third reading , voting: (54-5-1-0) | |
2011-03-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | House Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 3:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-24 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-12 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |