AZ SB1109 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2375

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Short-term limited duration insurance; notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term limited duration insurance; notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateChapter 8
2019-03-11SenateGovernor Signed
2019-03-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2019-03-04HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (28-30-2-0)
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-04HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2019-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2375 (Replaces) 2019-02-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201379Amended CodeSee Bill Text
201384New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71454
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1109p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1109s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0008.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.11091007.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1109fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71454&billStatusActionId=186265&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71454&billStatusActionId=186333&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71454&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71454&billStatusActionId=187538&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71454&billStatusActionId=187592&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71454&billStatusActionId=187681&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback